**Version:**1.20

**Price:**Free

**Downloadable version:**Full version

**Operating system:**Windows XP / Vista / 7 / 8

**Size:**4.48 MB (4594 KB)

If Basic Math Decoded has proven useful to you, a donation would be greatly appreciated. It would help us to maintain and enhance Basic Math Decoded. The amount to donate is up to your choice. Click the 'Donate' button to use PayPal and donate by credit or debit card. You don't even need a PayPal account! Note, donations are not tax deductible. Thank you.

This example has been taken directly from the solution given by Basic Math Decoded to the formulated problem.

**65984 × 736**

**Place one number beside the other with the multiplication symbol between them. Draw a line under the numbers.**

__65984×736__

**Multiply the number 65984 by the digit 7 and place the answer below the line. Write the answer in such way that the last digit be lined up with the digit being multiplied in the second number.**

**There are 2 blank spaces to the last column of the second number; this is because you are really multiplying the number by 700, which is the same that multiplying by 7 and by 100. Some books suggest writing zeroes instead of blank spaces, but it is the same when you add all the partial multiplications, at the end.**

Multiply the digits 7 and 4 (7 × 4 = 28).

This number is larger than 9, so place the 2 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 8 below the line.

2

__6598__

__4____×__

__7____36__

**8**

Multiply the digits 7 and 8 (7 × 8 = 56). Add the 2 to the answer which equals 58.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 5 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 8 below the line and to the left of the other digits.

5

**2**__659__

__8____4×__

__7____36__

**8**8

Multiply the digits 7 and 9 (7 × 9 = 63). Add the 5 to the answer which equals 68.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 6 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 8 below the line and to the left of the other digits.

6

**5**2__65__

__9____84×__

__7____36__

**8**88

Multiply the digits 7 and 5 (7 × 5 = 35). Add the 6 to the answer which equals 41.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 4 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 1 below the line and to the left of the other digits.

4

**6**52__6__

__5____984×__

__7____36__

**1**888

Multiply the digits 7 and 6 (7 × 6 = 42). Add the 4 to the answer which equals 46.

This number is larger than 9, but there are no more columns, so place the answer below the line and to the left of the other digits.

**4**652

__6____5984×__

__7____36__

**46**1888

**Multiply the number 65984 by the digit 3 and place the answer in a new row below the last one, moving one place to the right.**

**This is because you are really multiplying the number 65984 by 30, which is the same that multiplying by 3 and by 10, the power of ten immediately inferior at the previous multiplication.**

Multiply the digits 3 and 4 (3 × 4 = 12).

This number is larger than 9, so place the 1 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 2 below the line in the corresponding row.

1

__6598__

__4____×7__

__3____6__

461888

**2**

Multiply the digits 3 and 8 (3 × 8 = 24). Add the 1 to the answer which equals 25.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 2 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 5 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

2

**1**__659__

__8____4×7__

__3____6__

461888

**5**2

Multiply the digits 3 and 9 (3 × 9 = 27). Add the 2 to the answer which equals 29.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 2 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 9 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

2

**2**1__65__

__9____84×7__

__3____6__

461888

**9**52

Multiply the digits 3 and 5 (3 × 5 = 15). Add the 2 to the answer which equals 17.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 1 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 7 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

1

**2**21__6__

__5____984×7__

__3____6__

461888

**7**952

Multiply the digits 3 and 6 (3 × 6 = 18). Add the 1 to the answer which equals 19.

This number is larger than 9, but there are no more columns, so place the answer below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

**1**221

__6____5984×7__

__3____6__

461888

**19**7952

**Multiply the number 65984 by the digit 6 and place the answer in a new row below the last one, moving one place to the right.**

**This is because you are multiplying the number by the one's place, and in the previous multiplication you were multiplying by the ten's place.**

Multiply the digits 6 and 4 (6 × 4 = 24).

This number is larger than 9, so place the 2 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 4 below the line in the corresponding row.

2

__6598__

__4____×73__

__6__ 461888

197952

**4**

Multiply the digits 6 and 8 (6 × 8 = 48). Add the 2 to the answer which equals 50.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 5 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 0 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

5

**2**__659__

__8____4×73__

__6__ 461888

197952

**0**4

Multiply the digits 6 and 9 (6 × 9 = 54). Add the 5 to the answer which equals 59.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 5 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 9 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

5

**5**2__65__

__9____84×73__

__6__ 461888

197952

**9**04

Multiply the digits 6 and 5 (6 × 5 = 30). Add the 5 to the answer which equals 35.

This number is larger than 9, so place the 3 above the column on the left to be added in the next step and place the 5 below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

3

**5**52__6__

__5____984×73__

__6__ 461888

197952

**5**904

Multiply the digits 6 and 6 (6 × 6 = 36). Add the 3 to the answer which equals 39.

This number is larger than 9, but there are no more columns, so place the answer below the line in the corresponding row, and to the left of the other digits.

**3**552

__6____5984×73__

__6__ 461888

197952

**39**5904

**Final answer**

**Add all the rows together, and write the answer.**

__65984×736__

461888

197952

__395904__

48564224